NV SB490 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 571.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions relating to the foreclosure of real property. (BDR 9-488)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to the foreclosure of real property. (BDR 9-488)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-12SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 571.
2017-06-08SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2017-06-05SenateAssembly Amendment No. 1103 concurred in. To enrollment.
2017-06-05SenateIn Senate.
2017-06-05AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 28, Nays: 14.) To Senate.
2017-06-04AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-06-03AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-06-03AssemblyFrom printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint .
2017-06-03AssemblyRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1103.) To printer.
2017-06-02AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-06-02AssemblyDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2017-06-02AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-05-26AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
2017-05-26AssemblyIn Assembly.
2017-05-26SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint . To Assembly.
2017-05-25SenateTo printer.
2017-05-25SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.)
2017-05-25SenateReprinting dispensed with.
2017-05-25SenateRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 924.)
2017-05-25SenatePlaced on General File.
2017-05-25SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-04-25SenateExemption effective.
2017-04-25SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.
2017-04-24SenateRe-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.
2017-04-24SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. Nos. 485 and 583.)
2017-04-24SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2017-04-24SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-04-07SenateNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2017-03-29SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2017-03-27SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback