NV SB49 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to offenders; defining certain terms; requiring the Director of the Department of Corrections to establish a program of treatment for offenders with substance use, mental health or other addictive disorders; revising provisions related to programs of aftercare; repealing provisions relating to therapeutic communities; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires the Director of the Department of Corrections to establish a program of treatment for offenders with substance use, mental health or other addictive disorders. (BDR 16-201)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-04Senate(No further action taken.)
2019-04-16SenateExemption effective.
2019-04-16SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee.
2019-04-15SenateRe-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.
2019-04-15SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 13.)
2019-04-15SenateNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2019-04-10SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-02-04SenateRead first time. To committee.
2018-11-21SenateFrom printer.
2018-11-19SenatePrefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback