NV SB49 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-18 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 80.
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-18 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 80.
Summary
Creates a requirement for a written contract between a client and an architect, registered interior designer or residential designer under certain circumstances. (BDR 54-353)
Title
Creates a requirement for a written contract between a client and an architect, registered interior designer or residential designer under certain circumstances. (BDR 54-353)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-18 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 80. | |
2009-05-13 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-05-08 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |
2009-05-06 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Senate. | |
2009-05-05 | Read second time. | |
2009-05-05 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-05-05 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2009-04-09 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee. | |
2009-04-09 | In Assembly. | |
2009-04-08 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | |
2009-04-06 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-04-06 | Read third time. | |
2009-04-02 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-04-01 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-03-31 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. | |
2009-03-30 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1.) To printer. | |
2009-03-26 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-02-02 | Read first time. To committee. | |
2008-12-08 | From printer. | |
2008-12-05 | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=76 |