NV SB489 | 2015 | 78th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-05 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 383.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for the regulation of peer support recovery organizations. (BDR 40-1191)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for the regulation of peer support recovery organizations. (BDR 40-1191)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-05SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 383.
2015-06-03SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2015-05-31SenateAssembly Amendment No. 995 concurred in. To enrollment.
2015-05-31SenateIn Senate.
2015-05-30AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 28, Nays: 13, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
2015-05-30AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2015-05-29AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 995.) To printer.
2015-05-29AssemblyPlaced on Second Reading File.
2015-05-29AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2015-05-26AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.
2015-05-26AssemblyIn Assembly.
2015-05-25SenateRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.
2015-05-25SenateDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2015-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2015-04-10SenateRe-referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. Exemption effective.
2015-04-10SenateFrom committee: Re-refer to Committee on Finance.
2015-03-30SenateNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2015-03-25SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2015-03-23SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback