NV SB488 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 569.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions relating to certain crimes. (BDR 15-1086)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to certain crimes. (BDR 15-1086)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-12SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 569.
2017-06-08SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2017-06-05SenateAssembly Amendment No. 1078 concurred in. To enrollment.
2017-06-05SenateIn Senate.
2017-06-05AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.
2017-06-04AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-06-03AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-06-03AssemblyFrom printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
2017-06-03AssemblyRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1078.) To printer.
2017-06-02AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-06-02AssemblyDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2017-06-02AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-05-22AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
2017-05-22AssemblyIn Assembly.
2017-05-19SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2017-05-19SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2017-05-18SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 778.) To printer.
2017-05-17SenateTaken from Second Reading File. Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day.
2017-05-17SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2017-05-17SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-04-17SenateWaiver granted effective: April 17, 2017.
2017-04-15Senate(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
2017-03-29SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2017-03-27SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback