NV SB485 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter 520.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter 520.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to education; limiting the amount of reimbursement to which a hospital or other facility is entitled for educational services provided to certain pupils; authorizing certain hospitals or other facilities licensed in the District of Columbia or another state or territory of the United States to request reimbursement, under certain circumstances, for providing educational services to children in their care; revising the manner in which reimbursement is determined; authorizing the Department of Education, the county school districts, charter schools and the Division of Public and Behavioral Health of the Department of Health and Human Services to enter into a cooperative agreement for the provision of educational services to children with certain hospitals or other facilities licensed in another jurisdiction; making an appropriation; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to the education of certain children from Nevada who are patients or residents of certain hospitals or facilities. (BDR 34-397)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-27 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-27 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | Senate | Chapter 520. |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2019-06-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Vacant: 1.) To Senate. |
2019-06-02 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2019-06-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-05-28 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee. |
2019-05-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. To Assembly. |
2019-05-27 | Senate | To printer. |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Reprinting dispensed with. |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 934.) |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Placed on General File. |
2019-05-27 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Exemption effective. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 596.) |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Read second time. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer. |