NV SB483 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter 519.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter 519.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to mental health; requiring the Statewide Program for Suicide Prevention to include the provision of suicide prevention training for family members of veterans, members of the military and other persons who are at risk of suicide; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions governing the Statewide Program for Suicide Prevention. (BDR 40-1163)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-01 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-01 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | Senate | Chapter 519. |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2019-06-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Vacant: 1.) To Senate. |
2019-06-02 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2019-06-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-06-01 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee. |
2019-06-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2019-06-01 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To Assembly. |
2019-06-01 | Senate | To printer. |
2019-06-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) |
2019-06-01 | Senate | Reprinting dispensed with. |
2019-06-01 | Senate | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1073.) |
2019-06-01 | Senate | Placed on General File. |
2019-06-01 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Exemption effective. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Taken from General File. Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Read second time. |
2019-04-14 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer. |