NV SB48 | 2021 | 81st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-10 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to motor vehicles; requiring the Director of the Department of Motor Vehicles to designate a city officer of certain incorporated cities as an agent of the Department for certain purposes; requiring a portion of the governmental services tax collected in such a city to be credited to the city as a commission for the services of the city officer; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires the Director of the Department of Motor Vehicles to designate an agent to provide certain services in certain remote cities. (BDR 43-369)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-10Senate(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
2021-04-08SenateNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2021-02-01SenateRead first time. To committee.
2020-12-15SenateFrom printer.
2020-11-18SenatePrefiled. Referred to Committee on Growth and Infrastructure. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback