NV SB478 | 2013 | 77th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-01 - Chapter 346.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-01 - Chapter 346.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to the employment of offenders. (BDR 16-1202)
Title
Revises provisions relating to the employment of offenders. (BDR 16-1202)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-01 | Senate | Chapter 346. |
2013-06-01 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. |
2013-05-31 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Assembly Amendment No. 687 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2013-05-27 | Senate | In Senate. |
2013-05-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 38, Nays: 3, Excused: 1.) To Senate. |
2013-05-24 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint . |
2013-05-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 687.) To printer. |
2013-05-23 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2013-05-23 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2013-04-23 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. |
2013-04-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 15, Nays: 6.) To Assembly. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 350.) To printer. |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2013-04-19 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2013-03-27 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |