NV SB477 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 418.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to child welfare; revising provisions governing the release of a child in a child welfare proceeding to a parent or guardian; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits the release of a child to a parent or guardian in a child welfare proceeding in certain circumstances. (BDR 38-1005)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-05SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 418.
2019-05-30SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2019-05-28SenateAssembly Amendment No. 814 concurred in. To enrollment.
2019-05-27SenateIn Senate.
2019-05-24AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 39, Nays: None, Excused: 2, Vacant: 1.) To Senate.
2019-05-23AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2019-05-23AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2019-05-22AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 814.) To printer.
2019-05-21AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-04-17AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.
2019-04-17AssemblyIn Assembly.
2019-04-16SenateRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: 1.) To Assembly.
2019-04-15SenateTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2019-04-10SenateRead second time.
2019-04-09SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2019-03-26SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2019-03-25SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback