NV SB47 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 517.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Makes various changes relating to the appropriation of water. (BDR 48-499)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Makes various changes relating to the appropriation of water. (BDR 48-499)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-09SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 517.
2017-06-08SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2017-06-05SenateTo enrollment.
2017-06-05SenateConference report adopted by Assembly.
2017-06-05SenateConference report adopted by Senate.
2017-06-05SenateFrom committee: Concur in Assembly Amendment No. 832.
2017-06-04SenateConference Committee appointed by Senate. To committee.
2017-06-04SenateIn Senate.
2017-06-03AssemblyAssembly Amendment No. 832 not receded from. Conference requested. Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To Senate.
2017-05-26AssemblyIn Assembly.
2017-05-25SenateAssembly Amendment No. 832 not concurred in. To Assembly.
2017-05-25SenateIn Senate.
2017-05-24AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 31, Nays: 10, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
2017-05-24AssemblyFrom printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
2017-05-23AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 832.) To printer.
2017-05-22AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-04-26AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining. To committee.
2017-04-26AssemblyIn Assembly.
2017-04-25SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2017-04-25SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2017-04-24SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. Nos. 601 and 602.) To printer.
2017-04-24SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2017-04-24SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-02-06SenateRead first time. To committee.
2016-11-23SenateFrom printer.
2016-11-16SenatePrefiled. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback