NV SB469 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Vetoed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-03 - No further consideration.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-03 - No further consideration.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions governing collective bargaining by local government employers. (BDR 31-685)
Title
Revises provisions governing collective bargaining by local government employers. (BDR 31-685)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-21 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-21 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-03 | Senate | No further consideration. |
2017-06-03 | Senate | Bill read. |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Made Special Order of Business for Saturday, June 3, 2017, at 11:15 a.m. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor. Returned to Senate with Governor's veto message. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 26, Nays: 13, Excused: 3.) To Senate. |
2017-05-22 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-05-19 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2017-05-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 12, Nays: 9.) To Assembly. |
2017-04-21 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 316.) To printer. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |