NV SB468 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-13 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 580.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Makes changes relating to overtime and the calculation of hours worked for certain domestic service employees. (BDR 53-149)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Makes changes relating to overtime and the calculation of hours worked for certain domestic service employees. (BDR 53-149)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-13SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 580.
2017-06-01SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2017-05-30SenateAssembly Amendment No. 733 concurred in. To enrollment.
2017-05-29SenateIn Senate.
2017-05-26AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
2017-05-26AssemblyPlaced on General File.
2017-05-26AssemblyTaken from Chief Clerk's desk.
2017-05-25AssemblyPlaced on Chief Clerk's desk.
2017-05-25AssemblyTaken from General File.
2017-05-25AssemblyFrom printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
2017-05-24AssemblyRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 733.) To printer.
2017-05-23AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-05-23AssemblyDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2017-05-23AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-04-19AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.
2017-04-19AssemblyIn Assembly.
2017-04-19SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2017-04-19SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2017-04-18SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 261.) To printer.
2017-04-18SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2017-04-18SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-03-29SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2017-03-27SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback