NV SB467 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-13 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 579.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions relating to technology in public schools. (BDR 34-1120)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to technology in public schools. (BDR 34-1120)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-02 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-13SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 579.
2017-06-08SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2017-06-05SenateIn Senate. To enrollment.
2017-06-04AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 38, Nays: 4.) To Senate.
2017-06-03AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-06-03AssemblyDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2017-06-03AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2017-06-02AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee.
2017-06-02AssemblyIn Assembly.
2017-06-02SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint . To Assembly.
2017-06-02SenateTo printer.
2017-06-02SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.)
2017-06-02SenateReprinting dispensed with.
2017-06-02SenateRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1007.)
2017-06-02SenatePlaced on General File.
2017-06-02SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-04-25SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.
2017-04-24SenateRe-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.
2017-04-24SenateNotice of exemption.
2017-04-24SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 507.)
2017-04-24SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2017-04-24SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-03-29SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2017-03-27SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback