NV SB464 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-18 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-18 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the City of North Las Vegas; revising certain duties of the Mayor; revising certain prohibitions relating to special meetings; revising certain provisions relating to the procedure for enacting an ordinance; making certain changes to the powers of the City Council relating to animals; revising certain procedures for the suspension and removal of the City Manager; making various changes to the duties of the City Clerk; providing that the City Attorney may be removed under the terms of his or her employment agreement; authorizing the City Manager and City Attorney to take certain legal action for the collection and disposition of certain money; authorizing the City Council to appoint one or more Hearing Commissioners; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises the Charter of the City of North Las Vegas. (BDR S-1154)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-18 | Assembly | (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.) |
2019-04-17 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. |
2019-04-17 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Read second time. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |