NV SB464 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Vetoed by the Governor. (Return to 2019 Session)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes the Las Vegas Convention and Visitors Authority to require bidders, contractors or subcontractors to enter into agreements with labor organizations concerning employees who perform work on the renovation or expansion of the Las Vegas Convention Center. (BDR S-1041)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the Las Vegas Convention and Visitors Authority to require bidders, contractors or subcontractors to enter into agreements with labor organizations concerning employees who perform work on the renovation or expansion of the Las Vegas Convention Center. (BDR S-1041)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 11 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-08SenateVetoed by the Governor. (Return to 2019 Session)
2017-06-08SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2017-06-05SenateIn Senate. To enrollment.
2017-06-05AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 27, Nays: 15.) To Senate.
2017-06-05AssemblyTaken from Chief Clerk's desk. Placed on General File.
2017-05-26AssemblyWaiver granted effective: May 25, 2017.
2017-05-22AssemblyPlaced on Chief Clerk's desk.
2017-05-22AssemblyTaken from General File.
2017-05-19AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-05-18AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-05-17AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-05-16AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-05-15AssemblyRead second time.
2017-05-11AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2017-04-25AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.
2017-04-25AssemblyIn Assembly.
2017-04-24SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 11, Nays: 10.) To Assembly.
2017-04-24SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2017-04-21SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 315.) To printer.
2017-04-21SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2017-04-21SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-03-29SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2017-03-27SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback