NV SB464 | 2015 | 78th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-29 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 288.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-29 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 288.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions concerning criminal penalties for certain acts involving alcohol. (BDR 15-651)
Title
Revises provisions concerning criminal penalties for certain acts involving alcohol. (BDR 15-651)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-29 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 288. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2015-05-25 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2015-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 34, Nays: 8.) To Senate. |
2015-05-21 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2015-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2015-04-16 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. |
2015-04-16 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2015-04-15 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 348.) To printer. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |