NV SB460 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-03 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 312.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-03 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 312.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT making appropriations to certain state agencies for certain purposes; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Makes appropriations to certain state agencies for certain purposes. (BDR S-1176)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-30 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-30 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-03 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 312. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Assembly Amendment No. 860 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2021-05-31 | Senate | In Senate. |
2021-05-31 | Assembly | To Senate. |
2021-05-31 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2021-05-31 | Assembly | To printer. |
2021-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 36, Nays: 5, Excused: 1.) |
2021-05-31 | Assembly | Dispensed with reprinting. |
2021-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 860.) |
2021-05-31 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2021-05-31 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-05-30 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee. |
2021-05-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Read second time. |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-05-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer. |