NV SB46 | 2021 | 81st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Chapter 151.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to the Office of the Attorney General; authorizing certain employees of the Office of the Attorney General to request that certain personal information be kept in a confidential manner; authorizing such persons to request the Department of Motor Vehicles to display an alternate address on his or her driver's license, commercial driver's license or identification card; designating certain vehicles owned and operated by the Office of the Attorney General as emergency vehicles; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to the Office of the Attorney General. (BDR 20-410)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-28SenateChapter 151.
2021-05-27SenateApproved by the Governor.
2021-05-25SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2021-05-21SenateIn Senate. To enrollment.
2021-05-20AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 33, Nays: 8, Not voting: 1.) To Senate.
2021-05-19AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2021-05-18AssemblyRead second time.
2021-05-17AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2021-03-09AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.
2021-03-09AssemblyIn Assembly.
2021-03-08SenateRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2021-03-04SenateRead second time.
2021-03-02SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2021-02-01SenateRead first time. To committee.
2020-12-15SenateFrom printer.
2020-11-18SenatePrefiled. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback