NV SB457 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 603.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for the award of college credit for military education, training and occupational experience. (BDR 34-1080)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for the award of college credit for military education, training and occupational experience. (BDR 34-1080)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 603.
2017-06-08SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2017-06-05SenateIn Senate. To enrollment.
2017-06-05AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.
2017-06-04AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-06-03AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-06-02AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-06-01AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-05-31AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-05-30AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-05-30AssemblyDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2017-05-30AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2017-05-24AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee.
2017-05-24AssemblyIn Assembly.
2017-05-24SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2017-05-24SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2017-05-23SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 735.) To printer.
2017-05-23SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2017-05-23SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-04-04SenateNotice of exemption.
2017-04-03SenateRe-referred to Committee on Finance. To committee.
2017-04-03SenateFrom committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Committee on Finance.
2017-03-29SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2017-03-27SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Nevada State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Reports/history.cfm?ID=985
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Bills/SB/SB457.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Bills/SB/SB457_R1.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Bills/SB/SB457_EN.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Reports/BillVote.cfm?VoteID=915&fldReprint=1&fldDocTypeCode=SB&fldBillNumber=457&fldBillname=SB457
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Reports/BillVote.cfm?VoteID=1427&fldReprint=1&fldDocTypeCode=SB&fldBillNumber=457&fldBillname=SB457
Roll Callhttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Reports/BillVote.cfm?VoteID=915&fldReprint=1&fldDocTypeCode=AB&fldBillNumber=452&fldBillname=AB452
Roll Callhttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Reports/BillVote.cfm?VoteID=1427&fldReprint=1&fldDocTypeCode=AB&fldBillNumber=452&fldBillname=AB452

Bill Comments

feedback