NV SB456 | 2015 | 78th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-09 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 452.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-09 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 452.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises certain provisions concerning the control and preservation of certain accessory roads. (BDR 35-1089)
Title
Revises certain provisions concerning the control and preservation of certain accessory roads. (BDR 35-1089)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-09 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 452. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2015-05-29 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2015-05-29 | Assembly | To Senate. |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) |
2015-05-27 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2015-05-27 | Assembly | Action of concurrent referral to Committee on Ways and Means rescinded. |
2015-05-26 | Assembly | From Concurrent Committee on Transportation: Do pass. |
2015-05-18 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Concurrent Committees on Transportation and Ways and Means. To committees. |
2015-05-18 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2015-05-16 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 19, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Assembly. |
2015-05-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. Exemption effective. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Read second time. |
2015-04-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2015-04-03 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer. |