NV SB455 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on March 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes tax credits for employers who assist employees in paying for child care. (BDR 32-1006)
Title
Authorizes tax credits for employers who assist employees in paying for child care. (BDR 32-1006)
Sponsors
Sen. Patricia Farley [I] | Sen. Nicole Cannizzaro [D] | Sen. Patricia Spearman [D] | Sen. Joyce Woodhouse [D] |
Sen. David Parks [D] | Sen. Yvanna Cancela [D] | Sen. Mark Manendo [D] | Sen. Richard Segerblom [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-06 | Senate | (No further action taken.) |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Exemption effective. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 251.) |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Revenue and Economic Development. To printer. |