NV SB453 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-01 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 290.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to the Governor Guinn Millennium Scholarship Program; increasing the grade point average required during the first year of enrollment to retain eligibility for a scholarship; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises the eligibility requirements for the Governor Guinn Millennium Scholarship Program. (BDR 34-383)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-01SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 290.
2019-05-30SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2019-05-28SenateAssembly Amendment No. 788 concurred in. To enrollment.
2019-05-27SenateIn Senate.
2019-05-27AssemblyTo Senate.
2019-05-27AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2019-05-24AssemblyTo printer.
2019-05-24AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 39, Nays: None, Excused: 2, Vacant: 1.)
2019-05-24AssemblyDispensed with reprinting.
2019-05-24AssemblyRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 788.)
2019-05-24AssemblyPlaced on General File.
2019-05-24AssemblyTaken from Chief Clerk's desk.
2019-05-22AssemblyPlaced on Chief Clerk's desk.
2019-05-22AssemblyTaken from Second Reading File.
2019-05-22AssemblyPlaced on Second Reading File.
2019-05-22AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-04-11AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee.
2019-04-11AssemblyIn Assembly.
2019-04-08SenateRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2019-04-05SenateRead second time.
2019-04-02SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2019-03-26SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2019-03-25SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback