NV SB450 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-01 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 288.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to elections; revising the provisions relating to recall elections and the circulation and submission of a petition to recall a public officer; revising the provisions relating to the verification of signatures on a petition for recall of a public officer; establishing a limit on contributions to the campaign of a candidate in a recall election; requiring the disposal of unspent contributions to a candidate at a recall election; revising provisions relating to a request to remove a signature from a petition to recall a public officer; amending the deadline for filing a legal challenge to the sufficiency of a petition to recall a public officer; imposing civil and criminal penalties for violations of provisions governing recall elections; making various other changes relating to petitions for the recall of a public officer; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to recall elections. (BDR 24-71)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-01AssemblyApproved by the Governor. Chapter 288.
2019-05-30AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2019-05-28AssemblyAssembly Amendment No. 840 concurred in. To enrollment.
2019-05-24AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 30, Nays: 9, Excused: 2, Vacant: 1.) To Senate.
2019-05-24AssemblyFrom printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.
2019-05-23AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 840.) To printer.
2019-05-23AssemblyPlaced on Second Reading File.
2019-05-23AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-04-25AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.
2019-04-25AssemblyIn Assembly.
2019-04-23SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 16, Nays: 5.) To Assembly.
2019-04-23SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2019-04-22SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 539.) To printer.
2019-04-22SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2019-04-22SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-03-26SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2019-03-25SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback