NV SB446 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to Medicaid; authorizing a recipient of Medicaid to receive reimbursements for personal care services; suspending eligibility for Medicaid of a person who is incarcerated to the extent possible; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to Medicaid. (BDR 38-974)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-04Assembly(No further action taken.)
2019-06-03AssemblyIn Assembly.
2019-06-03SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. To Assembly.
2019-06-03SenateTo printer.
2019-06-03SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.)
2019-06-03SenateReprinting dispensed with.
2019-06-03SenateRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1136.)
2019-06-03SenateTaken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File.
2019-06-03SenateTaken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.
2019-06-03SenatePlaced on General File.
2019-06-03SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-04-19SenateExemption effective.
2019-04-19SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee.
2019-04-18SenateRe-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.
2019-04-18SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 356.)
2019-04-18SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2019-04-18SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-04-14SenateNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2019-03-26SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2019-03-25SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback