NV SB446 | 2013 | 77th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-01 - Chapter 341.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-01 - Chapter 341.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions governing education. (BDR 34-1077)
Title
Revises provisions governing education. (BDR 34-1077)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-01 | Senate | Chapter 341. |
2013-06-01 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. |
2013-05-31 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2013-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Senate. |
2013-05-27 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2013-05-27 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2013-05-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2013-05-22 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee. |
2013-05-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Placed on General File. |
2013-05-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Re-referred to Committee on Finance. Exemption effective. To committee. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Read second time. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2013-03-26 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer. |