NV SB443 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 528.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requires the Aging and Disability Services Division of the Department of Health and Human Services to employ sign language interpreters. (BDR 38-145)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires the Aging and Disability Services Division of the Department of Health and Human Services to employ sign language interpreters. (BDR 38-145)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-03 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-09SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 528.
2017-06-08SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2017-06-05SenateIn Senate. To enrollment.
2017-06-04AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: 2.) To Senate.
2017-06-04AssemblyDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2017-06-04AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2017-06-03AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.
2017-06-03AssemblyIn Assembly.
2017-06-03SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2017-06-03SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2017-06-02SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 921.) To printer.
2017-06-02SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2017-06-02SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-04-04SenateNotice of exemption.
2017-03-29SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2017-03-27SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback