NV SB442 | 2011 | 76th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-15 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 393.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-15 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 393.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the Fund for State Park Interpretative and Educational Programs and Operation of Concessions. (BDR 35-1210)
Title
Establishes the Fund for State Park Interpretative and Educational Programs and Operation of Concessions. (BDR 35-1210)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-15 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 393. | |
2011-06-06 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2011-06-05 | To enrollment. | |
2011-06-05 | In Senate. | |
2011-06-01 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. | |
2011-06-01 | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. | |
2011-06-01 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2011-05-20 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee. | |
2011-05-20 | In Assembly. | |
2011-05-19 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | |
2011-05-19 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . | |
2011-05-18 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 583.) To printer. | |
2011-05-16 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2011-04-04 | Notice of exemption. | |
2011-03-30 | From printer. To committee. | |
2011-03-28 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer. |