NV SB440 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on March 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extends to all counties the requirement for certain employees of establishments where alcoholic beverages are sold to complete certain training. (BDR 32-1003)
Title
Extends to all counties the requirement for certain employees of establishments where alcoholic beverages are sold to complete certain training. (BDR 32-1003)
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-06 | Senate | (No further action taken.) |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Exemption effective. |
2017-04-21 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 250.) |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Revenue and Economic Development. To printer. |