NV SB437 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-29 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 61. (Effective July 1, 2023)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to accountants; revising provisions governing the registration by the Nevada State Board of Accountancy of partnerships, corporations, limited-liability companies and sole proprietorships; revising requirements for a person to take an examination for and to obtain a certificate of certified public accountant; removing the requirement that the Board charge a fee for an examination for a certificate of certified public accountant; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions governing accountants. (BDR 54-1079)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-29SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 61. (Effective July 1, 2023)
2023-05-25SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2023-05-23SenateIn Senate. To enrollment.
2023-05-22AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
2023-05-19AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2023-05-18AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2023-05-16AssemblyRead second time.
2023-05-15AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2023-04-26AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.
2023-04-26AssemblyIn Assembly.
2023-04-25SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2023-04-25SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2023-04-24SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 520.) To printer.
2023-04-24SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2023-04-24SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2023-03-29SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2023-03-27SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback