NV SB436 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 39, Nays: None, Excused: 2, Vacant: 1.) To Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to professional entities; authorizing professional entities to provide professional services relating to the practice of chiropractic under certain circumstances; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to professional entities. (BDR 7-1147)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-24AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 39, Nays: None, Excused: 2, Vacant: 1.) To Senate.
2019-05-23AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2019-05-22AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2019-05-21AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2019-05-20AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2019-05-16AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2019-05-15AssemblyRead second time.
2019-05-14AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2019-04-19AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.
2019-04-19AssemblyIn Assembly.
2019-04-18SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2019-04-18SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2019-04-17SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 184.) To printer.
2019-04-17SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2019-04-17SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-03-26SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2019-03-25SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback