NV SB434 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-15 - Chapter 413. (Effective July 1, 2023)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to retirement; revising provisions governing eligibility for membership in the Public Employees' Retirement System; revising provisions governing the options for service retirement allowances under the System; revising provisions relating to the granting of a divorce; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions related to retirement. (BDR 23-16)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-15SenateChapter 413. (Effective July 1, 2023)
2023-06-13SenateApproved by the Governor.
2023-06-08SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2023-06-04SenateAssembly Amendment No. 630 concurred in. To enrollment.
2023-05-27SenateIn Senate.
2023-05-26AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
2023-05-26AssemblyFrom printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.
2023-05-25AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 630.) To printer.
2023-05-25AssemblyPlaced on Second Reading File.
2023-05-25AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2023-04-26AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.
2023-04-26AssemblyIn Assembly.
2023-04-25SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 19, Nays: 2.) To Assembly.
2023-04-25SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2023-04-24SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 523.) To printer.
2023-04-24SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2023-04-24SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2023-03-28SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2023-03-27SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback