NV SB433 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-01 - Chapter 391.
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-01 - Chapter 391.
Summary
Provides for salaries of certain state employees and provides for furloughs for certain public employees. (BDR S-1323)
Title
Provides for salaries of certain state employees and provides for furloughs for certain public employees. (BDR S-1323)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-01 | Chapter 391. | |
2009-06-01 | Enrolled and delivered to Secretary of State. | |
2009-05-29 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |
2009-05-29 | To Senate. | |
2009-05-29 | Bill read. Veto not sustained. (Yeas: 38, Nays: 4.) | |
2009-05-29 | In Assembly. | |
2009-05-28 | To Assembly. | |
2009-05-28 | Bill read. Veto not sustained. (Yeas: 18, Nays: 3.) | |
2009-05-28 | Made Special Order of Business for Thursday, May 28, 2009, at 10:00 p.m. | |
2009-05-28 | Vetoed by the Governor. Returned to Senate with Governor's veto message. | |
2009-05-22 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-05-22 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |
2009-05-22 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 37, Nays: 5.) To Senate. | |
2009-05-22 | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. | |
2009-05-22 | Read second time. | |
2009-05-22 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-05-22 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2009-05-21 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee. | |
2009-05-21 | In Assembly. | |
2009-05-21 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: 1.) To Assembly. | |
2009-05-21 | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. | |
2009-05-21 | Read first time. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=1162 |