NV SB432 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 568.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions governing proceedings for the termination of parental rights. (BDR 38-475)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions governing proceedings for the termination of parental rights. (BDR 38-475)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-12SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 568.
2017-06-08SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2017-06-05SenateTo enrollment.
2017-06-05SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Third reprint .
2017-06-04SenateTo printer.
2017-06-04Senate(Conference Amend. No. CA2.)
2017-06-04SenateConference report adopted by Assembly.
2017-06-04SenateConference report adopted by Senate.
2017-06-04SenateFrom committee: Concur in Assembly Amendment No. 886 and further amend.
2017-06-02SenateConference Committee appointed by Senate. To committee.
2017-05-31SenateIn Senate.
2017-05-30AssemblyAssembly Amendment No. 886 not receded from. Conference requested. Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To Senate.
2017-05-26AssemblyIn Assembly.
2017-05-26SenateAssembly Amendment No. 886 not concurred in. To Assembly.
2017-05-26SenateIn Senate.
2017-05-25AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Senate.
2017-05-25AssemblyFrom printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
2017-05-24AssemblyRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 886.) To printer.
2017-05-23AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-05-23AssemblyDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2017-05-23AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-04-19AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
2017-04-19AssemblyIn Assembly.
2017-04-19SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2017-04-19SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2017-04-18SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 286.) To printer.
2017-04-18SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2017-04-18SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-03-28SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2017-03-27SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback