NV SB427 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Vetoed by the Governor. (Return to 2019 Session.)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions governing the crew of certain freight trains. (BDR 58-1014)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions governing the crew of certain freight trains. (BDR 58-1014)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-08SenateVetoed by the Governor. (Return to 2019 Session.)
2017-06-05SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2017-06-04SenateIn Senate. To enrollment.
2017-06-03AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 27, Nays: 11, Excused: 4.) To Senate.
2017-06-02AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-06-01AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-05-31AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-05-30AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-05-30AssemblyDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2017-05-30AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2017-05-24AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To committee.
2017-05-24AssemblyIn Assembly.
2017-05-23SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 12, Nays: 9.) To Assembly.
2017-05-23SenatePlaced on General File.
2017-05-23SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended.
2017-04-20SenateExemption effective.
2017-04-20SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.
2017-04-19SenateRe-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.
2017-04-19SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 321.)
2017-04-18SenateFrom committee: Amend, and re-refer to Committee on Finance.
2017-04-04SenateNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2017-03-24SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2017-03-23SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback