NV SB426 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-20 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-20 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires drivers and passengers of mopeds and trimobiles to wear protective headgear. (BDR 43-1011)
Title
Requires drivers and passengers of mopeds and trimobiles to wear protective headgear. (BDR 43-1011)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-20 | Assembly | (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.) |
2017-04-19 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To committee. |
2017-04-19 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: 1.) To Assembly. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Read second time. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer. |