NV SB425 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-01 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 410.
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-01 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 410.
Summary
Extends reversion for previous session appropriation for the Institute for Neuro-Immune Disease. (BDR S-1311)
Title
Extends reversion for previous session appropriation for the Institute for Neuro-Immune Disease. (BDR S-1311)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-01 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 410. | |
2009-05-29 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-05-28 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |
2009-05-28 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate. | |
2009-05-27 | Read second time. | |
2009-05-27 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-05-27 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2009-05-18 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee. | |
2009-05-18 | In Assembly. | |
2009-05-18 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: 1.) To Assembly. | |
2009-05-18 | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. | |
2009-05-18 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2009-05-12 | From printer. To committee. | |
2009-05-11 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=1135 |