NV SB424 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-01 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 409.
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-01 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 409.
Summary
Makes an appropriation to the Fund for Insurance Premiums, commonly known as the Attorney General's Tort Claim Fund. (BDR S-1313)
Title
Makes an appropriation to the Fund for Insurance Premiums, commonly known as the Attorney General's Tort Claim Fund. (BDR S-1313)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-01 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 409. | |
2009-05-29 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-05-28 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |
2009-05-28 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate. | |
2009-05-27 | Read second time. | |
2009-05-27 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-05-27 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2009-05-18 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee. | |
2009-05-18 | In Assembly. | |
2009-05-18 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | |
2009-05-18 | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. | |
2009-05-18 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2009-05-12 | From printer. To committee. | |
2009-05-11 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=1134 |