NV SB42 | 2015 | 78th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-02 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-02 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Investigation Division of the Department of Public Safety to provide investigative services to other divisions of the Department and certain other units of the Executive Department of the State Government. (BDR 43-357)
Title
Requires the Investigation Division of the Department of Public Safety to provide investigative services to other divisions of the Department and certain other units of the Executive Department of the State Government. (BDR 43-357)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-02 | Senate | (No further action taken.) |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Exemption effective. |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Taken from Second Reading File. Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Read first time. To committee. |
2014-12-22 | Senate | From printer. |
2014-12-20 | Senate | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/78th2015/Reports/history.cfm?ID=55 |
Text | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/78th2015/Bills/SB/SB42.pdf |