NV SB418 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-02 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 189. (Effective October 1, 2023)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to judiciary; requiring a candidate for judicial office who is not the incumbent to complete and file a questionnaire containing certain information relating to his or her qualifications for office; authorizing a candidate for judicial office who is the incumbent to complete and file such a questionnaire; requiring the filing officer to post such a questionnaire on the internet website of the filing officer; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to candidates for judicial office. (BDR 24-803)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-02SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 189. (Effective October 1, 2023)
2023-06-01SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2023-05-31SenateAssembly Amendment No. 699 concurred in. To enrollment.
2023-05-26SenateIn Senate.
2023-05-26AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 38, Nays: 2, Excused: 2.) To Senate.
2023-05-26AssemblyFrom printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.
2023-05-25AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 699.) To printer.
2023-05-25AssemblyPlaced on Second Reading File.
2023-05-25AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2023-04-24AssemblyRereferred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.
2023-04-24AssemblyWithdrawn from Committee on Judiciary.
2023-04-21AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
2023-04-21AssemblyIn Assembly.
2023-04-20SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2023-04-20SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2023-04-19SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 350.) To printer.
2023-04-19SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2023-04-19SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2023-03-28SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2023-03-27SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback