NV SB417 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the establishment of programs to encourage tenants of housing projects to save money for certain purposes. (BDR 25-836)
Title
Provides for the establishment of programs to encourage tenants of housing projects to save money for certain purposes. (BDR 25-836)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-06 | Senate | (No further action taken.) |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Re-refer to Committee on Finance. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Waiver granted effective: April 13, 2017. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Reports/history.cfm?ID=898 |
Text | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Bills/SB/SB417.pdf |