NV SB415 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to economic development; creating the Volens et Potens Committee; prescribing the duties of the Committee; requiring the Committee to cause the formation of a nonprofit corporation, the purpose of which is to act as a limited partner of the Volens et Potens Investment Fund; requiring the nonprofit corporation to be governed by the Volens et Potens Infrastructure Board; authorizing the Office of Economic Development to approve applications for tax credits submitted by persons who contribute money to the Board; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to economic development. (BDR 18-879)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-04Senate(No further action taken.)
2019-04-15SenateExemption effective.
2019-04-15SenateRe-referred to Committee on Finance. To committee.
2019-04-15SenateFrom committee: Re-refer to Committee on Finance.
2019-04-05SenateNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2019-03-22SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2019-03-21SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Revenue and Economic Development. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback