NV SB413 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 299.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 299.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Public Lands Day in the State of Nevada. (BDR 19-772)
Title
Establishes Public Lands Day in the State of Nevada. (BDR 19-772)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-01 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 299. |
2017-05-27 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Assembly Amendment No. 839 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | In Senate. |
2017-05-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 33, Nays: 6, Excused: 3.) To Senate. |
2017-05-24 | Assembly | Placed on General File. |
2017-05-24 | Assembly | Taken from Chief Clerk's desk. |
2017-05-24 | Assembly | Placed on Chief Clerk's desk. |
2017-05-24 | Assembly | Taken from General File. |
2017-05-24 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint . |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 839.) To printer. |
2017-05-22 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2017-04-27 | Assembly | Rereferred to Committee on Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining. To committee. |
2017-04-27 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. Preamble adopted, as amended. (Yeas: 18, Nays: 3.) To Assembly. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 453.) To printer. |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2017-04-21 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |