NV SB408 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-28 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 273.
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-28 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 273.
Summary
Authorizes payments from the Patriot Relief Account in the State General Fund to certain members of the Nevada National Guard who return from deployment in a combat zone. (BDR 36-1183)
Title
Authorizes payments from the Patriot Relief Account in the State General Fund to certain members of the Nevada National Guard who return from deployment in a combat zone. (BDR 36-1183)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-28 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 273. | |
2009-05-22 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-05-21 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |
2009-05-20 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. | |
2009-05-20 | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. | |
2009-05-20 | Read second time. | |
2009-05-20 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-05-20 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2009-05-13 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. | |
2009-05-13 | In Assembly. | |
2009-05-12 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | |
2009-05-12 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. | |
2009-05-11 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 612.) To printer. | |
2009-05-08 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-04-14 | From printer. To committee. | |
2009-04-13 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=1077 |