NV SB406 | 2015 | 78th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-09 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 471.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions relating to public retirement systems. (BDR 23-1049)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to public retirement systems. (BDR 23-1049)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-09SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 471.
2015-05-30SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2015-05-28SenateAssembly Amendment No. 825 concurred in. To enrollment.
2015-05-25SenateIn Senate.
2015-05-22AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 41, Nays: 1.) To Senate.
2015-05-22AssemblyFrom printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
2015-05-21AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 825.) To printer.
2015-05-21AssemblyPlaced on Second Reading File.
2015-05-21AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2015-04-21AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.
2015-04-21AssemblyIn Assembly.
2015-04-20SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 19, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Assembly.
2015-04-20SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2015-04-17SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 475.) To printer.
2015-04-17SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2015-04-17SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2015-03-20SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2015-03-17SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback