NV SB404 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to education; establishing a credit against the modified business tax for taxpayers who donate money to a scholarship organization; setting forth certain requirements for a scholarship organization and for programs that receive grants from a scholarship organization; requiring a scholarship organization to submit an annual report to the Department of Education; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for the issuance of scholarships for certain career and technical education or early childhood education programs by scholarship organizations. (BDR 34-778)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-04Senate(No further action taken.)
2019-04-15SenateExemption effective.
2019-04-15SenateRe-referred to Committee on Finance. To committee.
2019-04-15SenateFrom committee: Re-refer to Committee on Finance.
2019-04-05SenateNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2019-03-22SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2019-03-21SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback