NV SB403 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - Chapter 602.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - Chapter 602.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to education; requiring each public and private school to provide certain information to a pupil or the parent or legal guardian of a pupil before providing technology to a pupil or allowing a pupil to use a school service; revising provisions relating to school service providers; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to data privacy for pupils. (BDR 34-309)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-13 | Senate | Chapter 602. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | To enrollment. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Fourth reprint. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | To printer. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | (Conference Amend. No. CA2.) |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Conference report adopted by Assembly. |
2019-06-02 | Senate | Conference report adopted by Senate. |
2019-06-02 | Senate | From committee: Concur in Assembly Amendment No. 786 and further amend. |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To committee. |
2019-05-31 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-05-31 | Assembly | Assembly Amendment No. 786 not receded from. Conference requested. Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To Senate. |
2019-05-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2019-05-25 | Senate | Assembly Amendment No. 786 not concurred in. To Assembly. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 1, Vacant: 1.) To Senate. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 786.) To printer. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 579.) To printer. |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 434.) To printer. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer. |