NV SB402 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on June 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to cannabis; establishing the Cannabis Mentorship Pilot Program; setting forth various requirements for the Program; authorizing the Cannabis Compliance Board to approve and issue a certificate of transferable tax credits to a licensee that participates in the Program as a sponsor; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates the Cannabis Mentorship Pilot Program. (BDR 56-1064)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-06Senate(No further action taken.)
2023-04-20SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee.
2023-04-19SenateRe-referred to Committee on Finance. Exemption effective. To printer.
2023-04-19SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 247.) Taken from General File.
2023-04-19SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2023-04-19SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2023-04-06SenateNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2023-03-28SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2023-03-27SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback