NV SB401 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to criminal procedure; requiring justice courts, municipal courts and district courts to maintain certain records relating to pretrial detention and submit such records to the Administrative Office of the Courts; requiring the Court Administrator to submit a quarterly report concerning pretrial detention to the Executive Director of the Department of Sentencing Policy and to the Legislature or the Advisory Commission on the Administration of Justice, as applicable, and to make the report available on the Internet; requiring county and city jails to notify the court having jurisdiction over a defendant if the defendant is held for more than 7 days after bail for the defendant is set at $2,500 or less; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Requires the reporting of certain information relating to pretrial detention. (BDR 14-378)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | Senate | (No further action taken.) |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Exemption effective. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Taken from General File. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 281.) |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2021-03-29 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |