NV SB401 | 2015 | 78th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-09 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 449.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-09 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 449.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to notaries public and document preparation services. (BDR 19-895)
Title
Revises provisions relating to notaries public and document preparation services. (BDR 19-895)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-09 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 449. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Assembly Amendment No. 733 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2015-05-21 | Senate | In Senate. |
2015-05-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate. |
2015-05-20 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint . |
2015-05-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 733.) To printer. |
2015-05-18 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2015-04-17 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. |
2015-04-17 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 474.) To printer. |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2015-04-15 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2015-03-20 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |